This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 15:05:57 (UTC).

MASON -v- YOGURTLAND, ETAL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 MASON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against YOGURTLAND, ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1746

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROY MASON

Defendants

FONTANA PLAZA LP

YOGURTLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOARDWALK LAW FIRM

888 Prospect Street

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/31/2017 OF ROY MASON - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/31/2017 OF ROY MASON - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL(SETTLED); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ROY MASON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; (CLERKS CALENDAR); CLERK: PATRICIA VEGA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY ROBERT W MORRIS FOR BOARDWALK LAW FIRM FOR PLAINTIFF..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL REPRESENTS THE MATTER HAS SETTLED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL(SETTLED) SET FOR 09/29/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO FONTANA PLAZA LP, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FONTANA PLAZA LP; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/01/17 WITH COSTS OF $120.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ROY MASON IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ROY MASON FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/31/2017 OF ROY MASON - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ROY MASON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.