This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/10/2018 at 17:07:35 (UTC).

MASCORRO VS PERALTA

Case Summary

On 02/18/2011 MASCORRO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PERALTA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0156

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISMAEL MASCORRO

Defendant

ALFREDO PERALTA

 

Court Documents

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

STIPULATION RE: PRO TEM FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: PRO TEM FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: PRO TEM FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: PRO TEM FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO ALFREDO PERALTA. PARTY SERVED ON 03/28/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO ALFREDO PERALTA. PARTY SERVED ON 03/28/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110218-0632 $50.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 07/06/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DONALD DENCH, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ISMAEL MASCORRO PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ALFREDO PERALTA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; ALFREDO PERALTA NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; 10:47; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.; WITNESS -- ISMAEL MASCORRO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION, BY THE COURT,; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ALFREDO PERALTA.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT ISMAEL MASCORRO HAVE &; RECOVER FROM ALFREDO PERALTA:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,001.59 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $125.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,126.59; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: PRO TEM FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: PRO TEM FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL DORN, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ISMAEL MASCORRO PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ALFREDO PERALTA; PROCEEDINGS:; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; COURT FINDS THAT THE SERVICE WAS NOT TIMELY; PLAINTIFF NEEDS TO RE-SERVE THE DEFENDANT WITH TIMELY SERVICE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/16/11 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F2C.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.; TO THE DEFENDANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF CONTINUED DATE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO ALFREDO PERALTA. PARTY SERVED ON 03/28/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110218-0632 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.