This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:24:51 (UTC).

MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES-V-FERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES-V-FERNANDEZ was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9156

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

LUIS M FERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PRENOVOST NORMANDIN BERGH & DAWE

2122 N Broadway Ste 200

Santa Ana, CA 927062614

THE AUGUST LAW GROUP P.C

19200 Von Karman Avenue Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92612-8525

 

Court Documents

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC..

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC..

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LUIS M FERNANDEZ SERVED ON 11/21/17 WITH FEES OF $69.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LUIS M FERNANDEZ SERVED ON 11/21/17 WITH FEES OF $69.50.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AS TO DOES ONLY

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D) FILED BY MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC..

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D) FILED BY MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC..

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LUIS M FERNANDEZ.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LUIS M FERNANDEZ.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LUIS M FERNANDEZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LUIS M FERNANDEZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRENOVOST NORMANDINBERGH & DAWE WITH THE AUGUST LAW GROUP P.C AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ORDERED ENTERED 01/31/18; JUDGMENT FOR: MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LUIS M FERNANDEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $7,789.16 INTEREST $584.40 ATTORNEY FEES $920.00 COSTS $379.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $9,672.56; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D) FILED BY MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LUIS M FERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AS TO LUIS M FERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LUIS M FERNANDEZ SERVED ON 11/21/17 WITH FEES OF $69.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 22.95 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 09/18/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $7,789.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170929-0786 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less