This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:06:45 (UTC).

MARY PEREZ

Case Summary

On 11/29/2016 MARY PEREZ was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1185

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO

Decedent

MARY PEREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

KELLIE M.T CHRISMAN

267 D Street

Upland, CA 91786

CHRISMAN, KELLIE M.T

267 D Street

Upland, CA 91786

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; CASE COMPLETE

RECEIPT RE: BENEFICIARY, SUZANNE M. DEBENEDETTO FILED.

RECEIPT RE: BENEFICIARY, SUZANNE M. DEBENEDETTO FILED.

RECEIPT RE: BENEFICIARY, LAUREN MORALES FILED.

RECEIPT RE: BENEFICIARY, LAUREN MORALES FILED.

RECEIPT RE: ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (JASON L GAUDY) FILED.

RECEIPT RE: ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (JASON L GAUDY) FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

ORDER APPROVING FIRST AND FINAL REPORT OF EXECUTOR; WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED

ORDER APPROVING FIRST AND FINAL REPORT OF EXECUTOR; WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED

FINANCIAL STATEMENTS FILED.

FINANCIAL STATEMENTS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/05/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/05/18 FILED.

FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO

FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: SUPPLEMENTAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: SUPPLEMENTAL ILED.

DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST AND ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST FILED.

DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST AND ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST FILED.

NOTICE TO DEPT OF HEATLH CARE SERVICES FILED BY SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO.

NOTICE TO DEPT OF HEATLH CARE SERVICES FILED BY SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO.

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL IAEA FILED.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; CASE COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: BENEFICIARY, SUZANNE M. DEBENEDETTO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: BENEFICIARY, LAUREN MORALES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (JASON L GAUDY) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPROVING FIRST AND FINAL REPORT OF EXECUTOR; WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JUDGE PRO TEM MITCHELL ROTH; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D RICE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY STEVEN URENDA PRESENT FOR SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; COURT CLEARS PROBATE NOTE #6.; FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 02/19/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY SUZANNE MARIE DEBENEDETTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161129-0743 $465.00; 161129-0743-CK Reference Number 12663

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.