This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 11:58:31 (UTC).

MARY LEICHT -N- DAVID LEICHT

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 MARY LEICHT -N- DAVID LEICHT was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2110

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARY J LEICHT

Respondent

DAVID A LEICHT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180413-0228 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/11/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 02/26/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF MARY LEICHT FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF MARY LEICHT ORDERED ENTERED 02/26/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DEFAULT HEARING; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; MICHAEL BISHAY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: REBECCA J. NAJAR; COURT REPORTER WENDY LUCERO 11855; BAILIFF: C MORRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MARY J LEICHT PRESENT; RESPONDENT DAVID A LEICHT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; WITNESS -- MARY LEICHT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- DAVID LEICHT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER RE: DISSO FILED BY MARY J LEICHT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PLEASE SEE JUDICIAL ASSISTANTS REJECT SLIP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MARY J LEICHT FOR PRELIM/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DAVID A LEICHT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARY J LEICHT FOR FIRST APPEARNCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0918 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF MARY J LEICHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MARY J LEICHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V12

    Read MoreRead Less