This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:41:37 (UTC).

MARY ELLEN CARROLL

Case Summary

On 09/28/2016 MARY ELLEN CARROLL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0973

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAMONT A CARROLL

Decedent

MARY ELLEN CARROLL

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING ETC FILED

ORDER OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING ETC FILED

ORDER OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING ETC FILED

ORDER OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING ETC FILED

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

HRG OF 09/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

RECEIPT RE: FROM DISTRIBITEE FILED.

RECEIPT RE: FROM DISTRIBITEE FILED.

RECEIPT RE: FROM DISTRIBUTEE FOR PROPERTY FILED.

RECEIPT RE: FROM DISTRIBUTEE FOR PROPERTY FILED.

RECEIPT RE: FROM DISTRIBUTEE FILED.

RECEIPT RE: FROM DISTRIBUTEE FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

RECEIPT RE: EILEEN D CARROLL FILED.

RECEIPT RE: EILEEN D CARROLL FILED.

RECEIPT RE: VIRGINIA C CARROLL FILED.

RECEIPT RE: VIRGINIA C CARROLL FILED.

HRG OF 09/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

ADMINISTRATORS REPORT FILED.

ADMINISTRATORS REPORT FILED.

WAIVER OF ACCOUNT BY DISTRIBUTEE, FILED.

WAIVER OF ACCOUNT BY DISTRIBUTEE, FILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

HRG OF 11/15/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/15/16 - PROBATE NOTES

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • VACATE HRFD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/17/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 09/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: FROM DISTRIBITEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: FROM DISTRIBUTEE FOR PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: FROM DISTRIBUTEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • EXPARTE PTN FOR FINAL DISCHARGE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PLEASE SUBMIT INFORMAL ACCTING ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PTN FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/15/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 161006-0299 $9.00; 161006-0299-VS Reference Number 025-0058098942

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LAMONT A CARROLL FOR PETITION; Minutes; Receipt: 160928-0736 $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LAMONT A CARROLL

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.