This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 20:59:11 (UTC).

MARY E SHEDDEN FAMILY TRUST DATED 9/21/1995

Case Summary

On 08/22/2017 MARY E SHEDDEN FAMILY TRUST DATED 9/21/1995 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0849

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCOTT MCMILLAN

Other

MARY E SHEDDEN FAMILY TRUST DATED

Not Classified By Court

SALLY FLANDERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KLEIN,DENATALE,GOLDNER,COOPER,ROSENLIEB,KIM

4550 California Ave Second Floor

Bakersfield, CA 93389

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

BORGIA, KRISTINE M

2155 Chicago Avenue Suite 306

Riverside, CA 92507

LESTER & CANTRELL,LLP

1770 Iowa Avenue Suite 110

Riverside, CA 92507

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 04/11/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/11/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/11/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/11/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF JOINDER IN RESPONDENT SALLY FLANDERS RE SPONSE TO PETITION FILED.

NOTICE OF JOINDER IN RESPONDENT SALLY FLANDERS RE SPONSE TO PETITION FILED.

ASSOCATION OF COUNSEL FOR SALLY FLANDERS, TRUSTEE FILED.

ASSOCATION OF COUNSEL FOR SALLY FLANDERS, TRUSTEE FILED.

HRG OF 01/09/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/09/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/09/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/09/18 - PROBATE NOTES

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

HRG OF 11/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

COVER SHEET FOR PROOF OF SERVICE RE: RESPONSE TO PETITION ETC FILED.

COVER SHEET FOR PROOF OF SERVICE RE: RESPONSE TO PETITION ETC FILED.

HRG OF 11/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

RESPONSE TO PETITION TO DECLARE TRUST INVALID FOR UNDUE INFLUENCE AND LACK OF CAPACITY ETC FILED.

RESPONSE TO PETITION TO DECLARE TRUST INVALID FOR UNDUE INFLUENCE AND LACK OF CAPACITY ETC FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/2717 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/2717 FILED.

PETITION RE: TO DECLARE TRUST INVALID FOR UNDUE INFLUENCE & LACK OF CAPACITY FILED.

PETITION RE: TO DECLARE TRUST INVALID FOR UNDUE INFLUENCE & LACK OF CAPACITY FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • PETITION FOR TO DECLARE TRUST INVALID FOR UNDUE INFLUENCE & LACK OF CAPACITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON STATUS CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • PETITION FOR TO DECLARE TRUST INVALID FOR UNDUE INFLUENCE & LACK OF CAPACITY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; KURT VANSCHIVER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SCOTT MCMILLAN.; ATTORNEY COLIN NORTHCUTT PRESENT FOR TRUSTEE.; ATTORNEY BRYAN HARTNELL PRESENT FOR GAYL RITTER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); THE COURT RECOMMENDS MEDIATION BE HELD PRIOR TO SETTING TRIAL DATES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/14/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/14/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S37P; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY MR. NOTHCUTT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF DISCOVERY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; KURT VANSCIVER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SCOTT MCMILLAN.; ATTORNEY COLIN NORTHCUTT PRESENT FOR TRUSTEE.; ATTORNEY BRYAN HARTNELL PRESENT FOR GAYLE RITTER.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; SEE OTHER MINUTES THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/14/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY MR. NORTHCUTT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • HRG OF 07/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • HRG OF 07/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING ESTATE PLANNING FILED BY SALLY FLANDERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • PETITION FOR TO DECLARE TRUST INVALID FOR UNDUE INFLUENCE & LACK OF CAPACITY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT D RICE; APPEARANCES:; KURT D. VANSCIVER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SCOTT MCMILLAN.; ATTORNEY COLIN A. NORTHCUTT PRESENT FOR SALLY FLANDERS.; ATTORNEY BRYAN HARTNELL PRESENT FOR GAIL RITTER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT ORDERS SANDY FLANDERS TO FILE AND SERVE COPIES OF THE 1995 TRUST AND AMENDMENTS BY; 4/30/18 TO ALL PARTIES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/25/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; HEARING RE: STATUS OF DISCOVERY SET FOR 07/25/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SALLY FLANDERS FOR RESPONSE TO PETITION TO DECLARE TRUST INVALID; Minutes; Receipt: 171103-0450 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • ON THE PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 08/22/2017 OF SCOTT MCMILLAN, SALLY FLANDERS IS ADDED AS A OBJECTOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO PETITION TO DECLARE TRUST INVALID FOR UNDUE INFLUENCE AND LACK OF CAPACITY ETC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/2717 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SCOTT MCMILLAN FOR FAX/COPIES/ENVELOPE/POSTAGE; Minutes; Receipt: 170908-0353 $7.21; 170908-0353-VS Reference Number 031-0041767530

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON PET TO DECLARE TRUST INVALID FOR UNDUE INFULENCE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: TO DECLARE TRUST INVALID FOR UNDUE INFLUENCE & LACK OF CAPACITY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SCOTT MCMILLAN FOR FAXED PET TO DECLARE TRUST; Minutes; Receipt: 170824-0113 $52.21; 170824-0113-VS Reference Number 031-0037813631

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170824-0106 $465.00; 170824-0106-VS Reference Number 031-0037813631

    Read MoreRead Less