This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 11:58:35 (UTC).

MARY E PETERSON -V- ROBERT SINCLAIR

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 MARY E PETERSON -V- ROBERT SINCLAIR was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2111

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARY E PETERSON

Respondent

ROBERT SINCLAIR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 08/01/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF MARY PETERSON FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF MARY PETERSON ORDERED ENTERED 08/01/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 06/25/18 BY MARY E PETERSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MARY E PETERSON FOR PRELIMINARY, FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF MARY E PETERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF MARY PETERSON AS TO ROBERT SINCLAIR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROBERT SINCLAIR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ROBERT SINCLAIR; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARY E PETERSON FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170717-0525 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF MARY E PETERSON IS DEN.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY MARY E PETERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF MARY E PETERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MARY E PETERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MARY E PETERSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less