This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/24/2021 at 04:17:34 (UTC).

MARTINEZ VS TEAMSTERS

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TEAMSTERS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1068

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHARON LEE MARTINEZ

MARTINEZ, SHARON LEE

Petitioners and Defendants

TEAMSTERS LOCAL 1932

KORGAN, RANDY

Defendants

TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL 1932

RANDY CAMMACK

RANDY KORGAN

KORGAN, RANDY

Respondent

MARTINEZ, SHARON

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOUL LAW FIRM

Attorney at KOUL LAW FIRM

3435 Wilshire Blvd Suite 1710

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant and Petitioner Attorney

HAYES, ORTEGA & SANCHEZ, LLP

Attorney at HAYES, ORTEGA & SANCHEZ, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING PETITION-MOTION TO CONFIRM ARB AWAR

08/19/2020: ORDER GRANTING PETITION-MOTION TO CONFIRM ARB AWAR

NOTICE NOTICE OF LODGMENT FILED BY TEAMSTERS UNION

07/01/2020: NOTICE NOTICE OF LODGMENT FILED BY TEAMSTERS UNION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTIONON PET TO CONFIRM ARBITR

07/01/2020: PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTIONON PET TO CONFIRM ARBITR

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT. ABSTRACT OF JUD

10/25/2019: NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT. ABSTRACT OF JUD

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO RANDY CAMMACK, WITHOUT PREJU

08/01/2019: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO RANDY CAMMACK, WITHOUT PREJU

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE FILED BY TEAMSTERS UNI

02/19/2019: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE FILED BY TEAMSTERS UNI

RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY AND DEF

11/01/2018: RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY AND DEF

DECLARATION RE- IN SPPT OF REPLY TO OPPO FILED BY

10/25/2018: DECLARATION RE- IN SPPT OF REPLY TO OPPO FILED BY

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- MTN TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL

10/19/2018: OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- MTN TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- COMPEL ARBITRATION AND ST

10/19/2018: OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- COMPEL ARBITRATION AND ST

NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL-STRIKE PLEA

09/27/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL-STRIKE PLEA

MOTION RE- TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY LITIG

09/17/2018: MOTION RE- TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY LITIG

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER-NTC OF MTN FOR ARBITRAT

09/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER-NTC OF MTN FOR ARBITRAT

DECLARATION OF TRACY JONES IN SUPP OF DEF MTN TO C

09/17/2018: DECLARATION OF TRACY JONES IN SUPP OF DEF MTN TO C

ANSWER FILED BY TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL 1932, RANDY

09/17/2018: ANSWER FILED BY TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL 1932, RANDY

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

08/14/2018: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

08/14/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

08/14/2018: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Petition/Request Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Comment; Comment: (ON COURT'S OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: PETITION/MOTION TO CONFIRM ARB AWARD GRANTED.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Comment: HEARING RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR.,JUDGE CLERK: KIM ALLAIN COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON;11800 COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SHARON LEE MARTINEZ DENNIS J. ORTEGA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL 1932, RANDY KORGAN. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COURT FINDS ALLEGATIONS IN PETITION TRUE AND THE PETITION IS GRANTED. MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) OF TEAMSTERS LOCAL 1932 IS GRANTED STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPIES OF (2) MINUTE ORDERS TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:STATUS OF ARBITRATION WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR.,JUDGE CLERK: KIM ALLAIN COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON;11800 COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SHARON LEE MARTINEZ DENNIS J. ORTEGA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL 1932, RANDY KORGAN. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARB GRANTED ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Comment: MOTION RE: MTN PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBIT. RQST FOR DSML (7/01/20) FILED BY DEFENDANT TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL 1932, RANDY KORGAN WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR.,JUDGE CLERK: KIM ALLAIN COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON;11800 COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SHARON LEE MARTINEZ DENNIS J. HAYES APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL 1932, RANDY KORGAN. - MOTION TEAMSTERS LOCAL 1932, RANDY KORGAN'S MOTION TO GRANT PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION/DISMISS IS HEARD. NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED. COUNSEL SUBMITS ON PLEADINGS. - COURT FINDS: TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL 1932, RANDY KORGAN'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR DISMISSAL IS GRANTED. COURT CONFIRMS THE CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD AND DISMISSES BOTH DEFENDANTS FROM ACTION RENDERING THE COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT DISMISSED. ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. ON COURT'S OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: PETITION/MOTION TO CONFIRM ARB AWARD GRANTED. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO PARTIES NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: ORDER GRANTING PETITION/MOTION TO CONFIRM ARB AWARD AND DISMISS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketHearing Re:; Original Type: Hearing Re:; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: HEARING RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:STATUS OF ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketMotion Re:; Original Type: Motion Re:; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: MOTION RE: MTN PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBIT. RQST FOR DSML (7/01/20) FILED BY DEFENDANT TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL 1932, RANDY KORGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketService type not specified; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 08/13/2020; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROPOSED ORDER/ NOTICE OF HEARING BY MAIL/ ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON 08/12/20 AS TO SEE ATTACHED, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $2,010.00; Total Payments and Credits: $2,010.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF SHARON LEE MARTINEZ FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY SHARON LEE MARTINEZ FOR 1ST APP FEE 180814-0195-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 180814-0195-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 1321

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEAMSTER UNION LOCAL 572 A LABOR ORGANIZATIN is a litigant