This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 17:09:49 (UTC).

MARTINEZ VS NISSAN

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 MARTINEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NISSAN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2303

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALVADOR MARTINEZ JR

Defendants

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA

EMPIRE NISSAN, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NITA LAW FIRM

3055 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorneys

TARVIN, NATHANIEL J

GORDON & REES LLP

2211 Michelson Drive Suite 400

Irvine, CA 92612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY M. NICHOLAS NITA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SALVADOR MARTINEZ JR.; ATTORNEY NATASHA COVARRUBIAS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY DEMANDED BY DEFENDANT.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 5 DAYS; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 05/31/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/04/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EMPIRE NISSAN, INC., A BUSINESSENTITY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170804-0910 $435.00; 170804-0910-CK Reference Number #966197

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DEFENDANT EMPIRE NISSAN, INC., A BUSINESSENTITY FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • ANSWER FILED BY EMPIRE NISSAN, INC., A BUSINESSENTITY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GORDON & REES LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA.; Minutes; Receipt: 170726-0057 $150.00; 170726-0057-CK Reference Number 964394

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170424-0250 $435.00; 170424-0250-CK Reference Number 224969

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/23/17 WITH COSTS OF $36.05 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PLAINTIFF SALVADOR MARTINEZ JR FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SALVADOR MARTINEZ JR FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170209-0057 $435.00; 170209-0057-CK Reference Number 1235

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF MISSING DOCUMENT SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE FILE A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT WITH THE COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.