This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 06:22:25 (UTC).

MARTINEZ-V-DARDON

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MARTINEZ-V-DARDON was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8762

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELANIA MARTINEZ ALMAZAN

Defendant

RONNIE DARDON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF MELANIA ALMAZAN FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF MELANIA ALMAZAN FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF MELANIA ALMAZAN ORDERED ENTERED 01/05/18; JUDGMENT FOR: MELANIA MARTINEZ ALMAZAN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RONNIE DARDON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,000.00; SEE JUDGMENT FOR SPECIFICS PERTAINING TO ACCESS TO FRONT YARD TO ALLOW WATER LINE; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON RONNIE DARDON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/01/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON RONNIE DARDON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/01/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON RONNIE DARDON.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON RONNIE DARDON.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST RONNIE DARDON FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST RONNIE DARDON FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • MOTION RE: FOR CONTEMPT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MELANIA MARTINEZ ALMAZAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONTEMPT BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/14/18 AS TO RONNIE DARDON, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR MELANIA MARTINEZ ALMAZAN ARE WAIVED FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 5025.00 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MELANIA MARTINEZ ALMAZAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MELANIA MARTINEZ ALMAZAN IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MELANIA MARTINEZ ALMAZAN FOR MOTION FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • MOTION RE: FOR CONTEMPT SET FOR HEARING ON 09/20/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MELANIA MARTINEZ ALMAZAN (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT RONNIE DARDON; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MELANIA MARTINEZ ALMAZAN PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; COURT FINDS THAT A CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED INTERPRETER IS NOT AVAILABLE.; MELANIA MARTINEZ ALMAZAN HAS WAIVED THE APPOINTMENT OF A CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED INTERPRETER AND THE APPOINTMENT OF AN INTERPRETER FOUND PROVISIONALLY QUALIFIED BY THE PRESIDING JUDGE.; THE COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO APPOINT AN INTERPRETER THAT IS NOT CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED OR PROVISIONALLY QUALIFIED.; THE COURT FINDS THAT THE PROPOSED INTERPRETER MEETS THE REQUIREMENTS OF GC68561 AND THAT ALL PERTINENT JUDICIAL COUNCIL PROCEDURES AND GUIDELINES HAVE; BEEN FOLLOWED. THE COURT ALSO FINDS THAT THE INTERPRETER IS QUALIFIED TO INTERPRET IN THIS PROCEEDING ONLY.; MARIA PEREZ HAS TAKEN THE OATH TO INTERPRET SPANISH INTO ENGLISH AND ENGLISH INTO SPANISH.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:50; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE/NO PROPER SERVICE OF MOTION; COURT ADVISES PLAINTIFF PRESENT IN COURT THAT MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT AND SET FOR TODAY HAS; BEEN FOUND NOT PROPERLY SERVED.; COURT FURTHER NOTES DEFENDANTS FEE WAIVER FILED AT THE TIME OF FILING OF MOTION WAS DENIED AND; DEFENDANT HAS FAILED TO PAY THE REQUIRED MOTION FEES.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:52; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MELANIA MARTINEZ ALMAZAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MELANIA MARTINEZ ALMAZAN IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MELANIA MARTINEZ ALMAZAN FOR 1ST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less