This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/15/2018 at 00:11:32 (UTC).

MARTHA SANCHEZ -V- CHRISTY JORQUEZ

Case Summary

On 02/04/2010 MARTHA SANCHEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTY JORQUEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1123

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTHA SANCHEZ

Defendants

FERNANDO MOLINAR

CHRISTY JORQUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CURRIE, DAVID G

5230 D St

Chino, CA 91710

 

Court Documents

ORDER M/O AMENDED NPT, TO ADD AFS AMT $3,540.00 TOTAL JUDGMENT IS $141,000.00 FILED

ORDER M/O AMENDED NPT, TO ADD AFS AMT $3,540.00 TOTAL JUDGMENT IS $141,000.00 FILED

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110222-1547 $40.00

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT FILED.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT FILED.

DECLARATION OF MARTHA SANCHEZ TO REQUEST THE COURT TO ENTER JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585 (B) FILED

DECLARATION OF MARTHA SANCHEZ TO REQUEST THE COURT TO ENTER JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585 (B) FILED

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): INCLUDES ATTORNEY FEES, REQUEST FOR ENTRY MUST MATCH JUDGMENT.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): INCLUDES ATTORNEY FEES, REQUEST FOR ENTRY MUST MATCH JUDGMENT.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CHRISTY JORQUEZ FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CHRISTY JORQUEZ FILED.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF FILED BY MARTHA SANCHEZ

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF FILED BY MARTHA SANCHEZ

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO FERNANDO MOLINAR, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO FERNANDO MOLINAR, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DECLARATION OF YOLANDA BALDERAMA RE: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED

DECLARATION OF YOLANDA BALDERAMA RE: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MARTHA SANCHEZ.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MARTHA SANCHEZ.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT/ADR PACKAGE/COVER SHEET FILED AS TO CHRISTY JORQUEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 03/12/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT/ADR PACKAGE/COVER SHEET FILED AS TO CHRISTY JORQUEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 03/12/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/04/2010 OF MARTHA SANCHEZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/04/2010 OF MARTHA SANCHEZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100204-0347 $355.00

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2011
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: COM-POST Disp.; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE KAZALUNAS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT P COOPER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVID G CURRIE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT CHRISTY JORQUEZ PRESENT; AFTER PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL LEFT COURTROOM.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; NO PROOF OF SERVICE, POSSIBLE BANKRUPTCY FILED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: COM-POST Disp.; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: GINA ZAMUDIO; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT P COOPER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVID G CURRIE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CHRISTY JORQUEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL TO SERVE THE DEFENDANT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/04/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER M/O AMENDED NPT, TO ADD AFS AMT $3,540.00 TOTAL JUDGMENT IS $141,000.00 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION/COURT ORDER RE: INCORRECT JUDGMENT AMOUNT * SENT DEPARTMENT R9 WITH FILE FOR REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARTHA SANCHEZ FOR WRIT AND ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 110222-1572 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110222-1547 $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 141000.00 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MARTHA SANCHEZ TO REQUEST THE COURT TO ENTER JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585 (B) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MARTHA SANCHEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT/ADR PACKAGE/COVER SHEET FILED AS TO CHRISTY JORQUEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 03/12/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 05/06/10 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN PRESIDING.; CLERK: MARLENE GALINDO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT P COOPER; APPEARANCES:; DAVID G CURRIE FOR MARTHA SANCHEZ NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 08:44; NO APPEARANCE.; NO PHONE CALL RECEIVED BY PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS DEFENDANT HAS FAILED TO APPEAR TODAY AND NO PROOF OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED.; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 PAYABLE TO SUPERIOR COURT OF RANCHO CUCAMONGA ON OR BEFORE 07/02/10.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/02/10 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/04/2010 OF MARTHA SANCHEZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100204-0347 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less