This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 04/29/2019 at 18:57:44 (UTC).

MARROQUIN -V- TRANSWORLD AGENCY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2010 MARROQUIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRANSWORLD AGENCY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1647

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARYLOU MARROQUIN

Defendant

TRANSWORLD AGENCY,INC

 

Court Documents

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL ON 10/28/10 AS TO MRS DURON, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL ON 10/28/10 AS TO MRS DURON, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL ON 10/28/10 AS TO MRS DURON, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL ON 10/28/10 AS TO MRS DURON, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL ON 10/28/10 AS TO MRS DURON, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL ON 10/28/10 AS TO MRS DURON, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC SUBPOENA BY PERS SVC ON 07/16/10 AS TO UPS EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC SUBPOENA BY PERS SVC ON 07/16/10 AS TO UPS EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC SUBPOENA BY PERS SVC ON 07/16/10 AS TO UPS EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC SUBPOENA BY PERS SVC ON 07/16/10 AS TO UPS EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC SUBPOENA BY PERS SVC ON 07/16/10 AS TO UPS EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC SUBPOENA BY PERS SVC ON 07/16/10 AS TO UPS EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC SUBPOENA BY PERS SVC ON 07/16/10 AS TO UPS EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC SUBPOENA BY PERS SVC ON 07/16/10 AS TO UPS EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FILED. (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED AT COUNTER PICKUP 02/15/11 ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED AT COUNTER PICKUP 02/15/11 ) (IMAGED)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $165.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $11.55), AND

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $165.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $11.55), AND

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

DECLARATION RE: STATEMENT OF RAY PARA TO MICHAEL KIM RE: SUBPOENA FILED BY MARYLOU MARROQUIN (IMAGED)

DECLARATION RE: STATEMENT OF RAY PARA TO MICHAEL KIM RE: SUBPOENA FILED BY MARYLOU MARROQUIN (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF TRANSWORLD AGENCY,INC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF TRANSWORLD AGENCY,INC FILED. (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING IS GRANTED, AS REQUESTED BY TRANSWORLD AGENCY,INC. (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING IS GRANTED, AS REQUESTED BY TRANSWORLD AGENCY,INC. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLTF CLAIM FILED AS TO TRANSWORLD AGENCY,INC. PARTY SERVED ON 07/16/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSERVE. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLTF CLAIM FILED AS TO TRANSWORLD AGENCY,INC. PARTY SERVED ON 07/16/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSERVE. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110426-0433 $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • WRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $12.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • EXHIBITS DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED AT COUNTER PICKUP 02/15/11 ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • WRIT/ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $165.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $11.55), AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • WRIT/COST MEMO IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CANT CLAIM COST NOT SPENT BEFORE ISSUANCE OF WRIT & MISSING PG 2 OF COST MEMO.

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC SUBPOENA BY PERS SVC ON 07/16/10 AS TO PACIFIC CITY BANK, FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC SUBPOENA BY PERS SVC ON 07/16/10 AS TO ERICA GARCIA, FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLTF CLAIM FILED AS TO TRANSWORLD AGENCY,INC. PARTY SERVED ON 07/16/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSERVE. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2010
  • SUBPOENAED RECORDS RECEIVED FROM UPS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF; Minutes; Receipt: 100617-4605 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM SCL TO SCM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less