This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/19/2019 at 16:03:22 (UTC).

MARK GOTO-V-MALOSI TAELEIFI

Case Summary

On 04/08/2011 MARK GOTO-V-MALOSI TAELEIFI was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3550

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARK GOTO

Defendant

MALOSI TAELEIFI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHIL MARR, LEGAL COUNSEL

30 N Raymond Ave Suite 408

Pasadena, CA 91103

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL O BY MAIL ON 05/24/11 AS TO MALOSI TAELEIFI, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL O BY MAIL ON 05/24/11 AS TO MALOSI TAELEIFI, FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

NON-NEGOTIABLE NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE FILED.

NON-NEGOTIABLE NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE FILED.

NON-NEGOTIABLE NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE FILED.

NON-NEGOTIABLE NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE FILED.

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 06/27/01 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT MARK GOTO HAVE &; RECOVER FROM MALOSI TAELEIFI:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $119,601.00 INTEREST $100,634.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $25.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $220,260.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 06/27/01 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT MARK GOTO HAVE &; RECOVER FROM MALOSI TAELEIFI:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $119,601.00 INTEREST $100,634.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $25.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $220,260.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT - CASE NUMBER RCVRS049675 (IMAGED)

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT - CASE NUMBER RCVRS049675 (IMAGED)

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT - CASE NUMBER RCVRS049675 (IMAGED)

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT - CASE NUMBER RCVRS049675 (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY MARK GOTO, FOR PLA.

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY MARK GOTO, FOR PLA.

ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PHILLIP J MARR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT MALOSI TAELEIFI PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR ORAP.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:30; DEFENDANT ADVISES THE COURT HE FILED FOR BANKRUPTCY ON MONDAY OF THIS WEEK.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF BK SET FOR 05/10/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; 08:31; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Continued

ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PHIL MARR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY WALTER R. MITCHELL FOR THIRD PARTY-KATHY TAELEIFI.; KATHY TAELEIFI NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:30; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF THIRD PARTY-KATHY TAELEIFI.; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; ORAP EXAMINATION CONTINUED.; KATHY TAELEIFI IS/ARE ORDERED TO RETURN ON CONTINUED DATE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE OR SUBPOENA.; BENCH WARRANT ORDERED TO ISSUE WITH BAIL SET AT $230,000.00 AND HELD TO 11/09/16.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/09/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:34; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF APP & ORDER BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/20/16 AS TO KATHY TAELEIFI, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF APP & ORDER BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/20/16 AS TO KATHY TAELEIFI, FILED.

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY FILED

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY FILED

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF O RDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION FILED.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF O RDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PHILIP BARBARO WITH PHIL MARR, LEGAL COUNSEL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR MARK GOTO.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PHILIP BARBARO WITH PHIL MARR, LEGAL COUNSEL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR MARK GOTO.

WRIT OF EXECUTION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUDGMENT DEBTOR NEEDS TO MATCH AS LISTED ON APPLIC ATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (.

WRIT OF EXECUTION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUDGMENT DEBTOR NEEDS TO MATCH AS LISTED ON APPLIC ATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (.

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARK GOTO FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 180126-0198 $3.00; 180126-0198-VS Reference Number 033-0051271363

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: RETURN OF DOCS (SATISFACTION OF JGMT) RECEIVED BACK FROM PHIL MAR, LEGAL COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • VACATE ORAP HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/14/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARK GOTO FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 171207-0316 $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST HAVE NOTARY ATTACHED FOR ABSTRACTS ISSUED PLEASE SUBMIT WITH IT ATTACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110615-4243 $40.00; 110615-4243-MC Reference Number 028-0028674609

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: FOR EARNINGS WITHOLDING ORDER AGAINST THE SPOUSE O F JUDGMENT DEBTOR (6/03/11) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARK GOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • NON-NEGOTIABLE NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE - PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL O BY MAIL ON 05/24/11 AS TO MALOSI TAELEIFI, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110505-0929 $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-NEGOTIABLE NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 06/27/01 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT MARK GOTO HAVE &; RECOVER FROM MALOSI TAELEIFI:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $119,601.00 INTEREST $100,634.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $25.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $220,260.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-4538 $30.00; 110504-4538-CK Reference Number 5264

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT - CASE NUMBER RCVRS049675 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less