This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 08:57:48 (UTC).

MARK GONZALEZ-V-XAVIER MANCHA

Case Summary

On 08/10/2017 MARK GONZALEZ-V-XAVIER MANCHA was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1949

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARK GONZALEZ

Defendants

EVELYN HAWKINS

XAVIER MANCHA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM E WINDHAM

5206 Benito St #115

Montclair, CA 91763

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:14; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOHN VANNI PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF MARK GONZALEZ PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: XAVIER MANCHA, EVELYN HAWKINS; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; XAVIER MANCHA, EVELYN HAWKINS HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; REQUESTS JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST XAVIER MANCHA, EVELYN HAWKINS.; JUDGMENT FOR: MARK GONZALEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: XAVIER MANCHA, EVELYN HAWKINS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $450.00 AND DAMAGES $843.18.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,793.18; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: XAVIER MANCHA, EVELYN HAWKINS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST XAVIER MANCHA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST XAVIER MANCHA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/10/17 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/10/17 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON XAVIER MANCHA; PARTY SERVED ON 08/10/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON XAVIER MANCHA; PARTY SERVED ON 08/10/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 08/15/17 AS TO 5206 BENITO STREET SUIT 115 MONCLAIR CA 91763, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 08/15/17 AS TO 5206 BENITO STREET SUIT 115 MONCLAIR CA 91763, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY EVELYN HAWKINS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY EVELYN HAWKINS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170810-0052 $255.00; 170810-0052-CK Reference Number 6103

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARK GONZALEZ FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0118 $25.00; 170928-0118-CK Reference Number 6164

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:14; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOHN VANNI PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF MARK GONZALEZ PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: XAVIER MANCHA, EVELYN HAWKINS; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; XAVIER MANCHA, EVELYN HAWKINS HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; REQUESTS JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST XAVIER MANCHA, EVELYN HAWKINS.; JUDGMENT FOR: MARK GONZALEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: XAVIER MANCHA, EVELYN HAWKINS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $450.00 AND DAMAGES $843.18.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,793.18; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: XAVIER MANCHA, EVELYN HAWKINS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • COPIES IN SASE TO ATTRNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON EVELYN HAWKINS FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 08/15/17 AS TO 5206 BENITO STREET SUIT 115 MONCLAIR CA 91763, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY EVELYN HAWKINS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EVELYN HAWKINS FOR COPIES/ENV; Minutes; Receipt: 170815-0497 $1.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EVELYN HAWKINS FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170815-0425 $0.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $18.33.--BEGINNING ON 08/07/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170810-0052 $255.00; 170810-0052-CK Reference Number 6103

    Read MoreRead Less