This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 09:28:26 (UTC).

MARIPOSA -V- SIMIEN

Case Summary

On 06/27/2013 MARIPOSA filed an Other lawsuit against SIMIEN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0036

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellants

MICHAEL SIMIEN

CHARLEY TAYLOR

Respondent

MARIPOSA ADELANTO,LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

GLASS, STEVEN E

1870 Verdugo Loma Dr. Ste#C

Glendale, CA 91208

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: REMITTITUR RECEIVED BACK FROM MICHAEL SIMIEN-UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • APPEAL COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • APPEAL FILED 06/27/2013 OF MICHAEL SIMIEN COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 08/02/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL RECEIVED BACK FROM APPELLANT-UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • PARTY CHARLEY TAYLOR UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL RECEIVED BACK FROM APPELLANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • APPEAL DISMISSED -- BEFORE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • NO DESIGNATIONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE UDVS 1300993 - VICTORVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARIPOSA ADELANTO LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLASS, STEVEN E