This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 23:04:26 (UTC).

MARIPOSA -V- GONZALEZ,ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 MARIPOSA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GONZALEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1190

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIPOSA ADELANTO LLC

Defendants

BRANDON GONZALEZ

NYDIA SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLASS, STEVEN E

1870 Verdugo Loma Dr. Ste#C

Glendale, CA 91208

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB); Minutes; Receipt: 170725-1002 $25.00; 170725-1002-CK Reference Number 770

STIPULATION RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:20; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT JR. PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; MARIPOSA ADELANTO LLC REPRESENTED BY SELINA CAPISOS.; DEFENDANT NYDIA SMITH PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: BRANDON GONZALEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; STIPULATED JUDGMENT RECEIVED, SIGNED AND FILED.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; COURT FINDS:; BRANDON GONZALEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; JUDGMENT FOR: MARIPOSA ADELANTO LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRANDON GONZALEZ, NYDIA SMITH; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $998.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $255.00 AND DAMAGES $1,331.50.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,984.50; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: BRANDON GONZALEZ, NYDIA SMITH. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 08/10/17.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; NO NEGATIVE CREDIT REPORTING PURSUANT TO CC 1786.18(A)(4).; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BRANDON GONZALEZ FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BRANDON GONZALEZ FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRANDON GONZALEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 06/10/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRANDON GONZALEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 06/10/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 06/05/17 AS TO STVEN E GLASS ESQ, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 06/05/17 AS TO STVEN E GLASS ESQ, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY NYDIA SMITH; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY NYDIA SMITH; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170531-0264 $255.00; 170531-0264-CK Reference Number 732

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB); Minutes; Receipt: 170725-1002 $25.00; 170725-1002-CK Reference Number 770

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:20; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT JR. PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; MARIPOSA ADELANTO LLC REPRESENTED BY SELINA CAPISOS.; DEFENDANT NYDIA SMITH PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: BRANDON GONZALEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; STIPULATED JUDGMENT RECEIVED, SIGNED AND FILED.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; COURT FINDS:; BRANDON GONZALEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; JUDGMENT FOR: MARIPOSA ADELANTO LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRANDON GONZALEZ, NYDIA SMITH; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $998.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $255.00 AND DAMAGES $1,331.50.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,984.50; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: BRANDON GONZALEZ, NYDIA SMITH. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 08/10/17.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; NO NEGATIVE CREDIT REPORTING PURSUANT TO CC 1786.18(A)(4).; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL RECEIVED BACK FROM NYDIA SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BRANDON GONZALEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY NYDIA SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 06/05/17 AS TO STVEN E GLASS ESQ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY NYDIA SMITH; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170605-0725 $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NYDIA SMITH FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170605-0614 $1.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $998.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $26.63.--BEGINNING ON 06/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170531-0264 $255.00; 170531-0264-CK Reference Number 732

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.