This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:09:34 (UTC).

MARIANO HERNANDEZ -V- CALIFORNIA STATE PERSONNEL

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 MARIANO HERNANDEZ filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CALIFORNIA STATE PERSONNEL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1397

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARIANO HERNANDEZ

Respondent

CALIFORNIA STATE PERSONNEL BOARD

801 Capitol Mall

Sacramento, CA 95814

Interested Party

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JOHN CHUNG LAW

2030 Main Street Suite 1300

Irvine, CA 92614

Respondent Attorney

CALIFORNIA STATE PERSONNEL BOARD

801 Capitol Mall

Sacramento, CA 95814

Interested Party Attorney

DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATIO

9035 Haven Ave Suite 200

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: WRIT OF MANDAMUS SET FOR HEARING ON 06/15/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: WRIT OF MANDAMUS SET FOR HEARING ON 06/15/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND (IMAGED)

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY MARIANO HERNANDEZ.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY MARIANO HERNANDEZ.

NOTICE OF WRIT OF MANDAMUS HEARING FILED BY MARIANO HERNANDEZ.

NOTICE OF WRIT OF MANDAMUS HEARING FILED BY MARIANO HERNANDEZ.

ANSWER FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATIO.

ANSWER FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATIO.

ANSWER FILED BY CALIFORNIA STATE PERSONNEL BOARD; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CALIFORNIA STATE PERSONNEL BOARD.

ANSWER FILED BY CALIFORNIA STATE PERSONNEL BOARD; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CALIFORNIA STATE PERSONNEL BOARD.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0204 $435.00; 171030-0204-CK Reference Number 3169

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT RE MOTION HEARING 08/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • MOTION RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ARTHUR SHIN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARIANO HERNANDEZ.; JOE WILLIAMS FOR CDCR REAL PROPERTY IN INTEREST PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; MARIANO HERNANDEZ'S MOTION PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE IS HEARD.; PRIOR TO COMMENCEMENT OF THE HEARING, THE COURTS WRITTEN TENTATIVE RULING IS HANDED TO; PARTIES PRESENT IN THE COURTROOM, AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL APPEARING BY COURT CALL. .; SUBMITTED ON COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING WITHOUT ARGUMENT; MR. WILLIAMS TO FILE PROPOSED JUDGMENT REGARDING THE COURTS RULING. IF THE JUDGMENT IS SIGNED; PRIOR TO NEXT HEARING, NO APPEARANCES ARE NECESSARY, HEARING WILL BE VACATED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : PROPOSED JUDGMENT RE MOTION HEARING 08/31/18 SET FOR 10/01/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • MOTION RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • NOTICE OF ERRTA AND ADDITIONS TO ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD FILED BY MARIANO HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • VACATE LM37 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • ON COURT'S MOTION, THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE HEARING PRESENTLY SET IN THIS CASE, IS ORDERED RESET FOR 08/31/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26. NOTICE SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • MOTION RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • VACATE LM37 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • ON COURT'S MOTION, THE HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE HEARING PRESENTLY SET IN THIS CASE, IS ORDERED RESET FOR 08/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26. NOTICE SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2018
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT R MITTAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ARTHUR SHIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY JOSEPH S. WILLIAMS, JR APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS HEARING ON PETITION.; COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER REPRESENTS THAT HE HAS RECEIVED THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD FROM; RESPONDENTS COUNSEL, HOWEVER INDICATES THAT THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD WAS PROVIDED ON A DISC, AND; HAS NOT PRINTED A COPY TO LODGE WITH THE COURT.; COURT FINDS THAT THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD LODGED WITH THE COURT SHOULD BE A CERTIFIED COPY, OR IN; THE ALTERNATIVE, COUNSEL MAY STIPULATE THAT RECORD LODGED IS A COPY OF THE CERTIFIED RECORD; RECEIVED.; HEARING IS CONTINUED BY THE COURT TO ALLOW TIME FOR PETITIONER TO LODGE THE ADMINISTRATIVE; RECORD. COUNSEL IS TO LODGE THE RECORD ON OR BEFORE THE NEXT HEARING DATE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATIO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR CALIFORNIA STATE PERSONNEL BOARD ARE WAIVED FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY CALIFORNIA STATE PERSONNEL BOARD; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CALIFORNIA STATE PERSONNEL BOARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF MARIANO HERNANDEZ, CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND IS ADDED AS A REAL PARTY IN INTEREST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0204 $435.00; 171030-0204-CK Reference Number 3169

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S26

    Read MoreRead Less