This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 00:53:24 (UTC).

MARIA REYNA RIOS HERNANDEZ -N- FRANCISCO V ZAMORA

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 MARIA REYNA RIOS HERNANDEZ -N- FRANCISCO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ZAMORA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0566

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARIA REYNA RIOS HERNANDEZ

Respondent

FRANCISCO VALENZUELA ZAMORA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 06/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF MARIA RIOS HERNANDEZ FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF MARIA RIOS HERNANDEZ ORDERED ENTERED 02/01/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST FRANCISCO VALENZUELA ZAMORA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF MARIA RIOS HERNANDEZ AS TO FRANCISCO VALENZUELA ZAMORA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MARIA REYNA RIOS HERNANDEZ FOR PRELIMINARY/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON FRANCISCO VALENZUELA ZAMORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FRANCISCO VALENZUELA ZAMORA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/26/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MARIA REYNA RIOS HERNANDEZ IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MARIA REYNA RIOS HERNANDEZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MARIA REYNA RIOS HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.