This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 18:17:51 (UTC).

MARGARET ELKINS

Case Summary

On 10/24/2016 MARGARET ELKINS was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0312

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LINDA WISE

BEVERLY FIELD

Conservatee

MARGARET ELKINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STEPHANIE MACUIBA

304 Saint Vincent

Irvine, CA 92618

Conservatee Attorney

SKORETZ, LENITA A

12 Nevada Street Suite C

Redlands, CA 92373

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENT FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW HRG FILED.

SUPPLEMENT FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW HRG FILED.

SUPPLEMENT FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW HRG FILED.

SUPPLEMENT FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW HRG FILED.

SUPPLEMENT FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW HRG FILED.

SUPPLEMENT FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW HRG FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED BEVERLY FIELD AND LINDA WISE IN THE AMT OF 148,000.00 BY LIBERTY MUTUAL FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED BEVERLY FIELD AND LINDA WISE IN THE AMT OF 148,000.00 BY LIBERTY MUTUAL FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED BEVERLY FIELD AND LINDA WISE IN THE AMT OF 148,000.00 BY LIBERTY MUTUAL FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED BEVERLY FIELD AND LINDA WISE IN THE AMT OF 148,000.00 BY LIBERTY MUTUAL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COPY OF 12/06/16 M.O TO STEPHANIE MACUIBA (IMAGED)

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COPY OF 12/06/16 M.O TO STEPHANIE MACUIBA (IMAGED)

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COPY OF 12/06/16 M.O TO STEPHANIE MACUIBA (IMAGED)

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COPY OF 12/06/16 M.O TO STEPHANIE MACUIBA (IMAGED)

REPORT OF COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL FOR CONSERVATEE FILED

REPORT OF COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL FOR CONSERVATEE FILED

REPORT OF COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL FOR CONSERVATEE FILED

REPORT OF COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL FOR CONSERVATEE FILED

HRG OF 10/03/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/03/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF TRANSFER ACTION AND REQUEST FOR RECEIPT (COPY) PLACED IN FILE

NOTICE OF TRANSFER ACTION AND REQUEST FOR RECEIPT (COPY) PLACED IN FILE

LETTERS ISSUED ( PERSON)

LETTERS ISSUED ( PERSON)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REPORT OF COURT APPT COUNSEL FOR CONSERVTEE BY MAIL ON 12/29/16 AS TO SEE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REPORT OF COURT APPT COUNSEL FOR CONSERVTEE BY MAIL ON 12/29/16 AS TO SEE LIST, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING CO-CONS FOR PERSON & ESTATE, BEVERLY FIELD & LINDA WISE APPOINTED WITH -- IAEA. BOND $148,000.00, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING CO-CONS FOR PERSON & ESTATE, BEVERLY FIELD & LINDA WISE APPOINTED WITH -- IAEA. BOND $148,000.00, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 12/06/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/06/16 - PROBATE NOTES

COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF CONSERVATOR EDUCATION COURSE OF LINDA WISE PLACED IN FILE. (IMAGED)

COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF CONSERVATOR EDUCATION COURSE OF LINDA WISE PLACED IN FILE. (IMAGED)

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY BEVERLY FIELD, LINDA WISE

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY BEVERLY FIELD, LINDA WISE

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF TRANSFER OF CASE TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 10/03/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/17 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 10/03/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF TRANSFER BY LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON 09/01/17 WITH NEW CASE NUMBER OF: RIP1701464.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC OF TRANSFER OF ACTION & REQ FOR RECEIPT RECEIVED BACK FROM STEPHANIE MACUIBA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • GREEN RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED FROM RIVERSIDE COUNTY (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER ACTION AND REQUEST FOR RECEIPT (COPY) PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • TRANSFERRED TO THE RIVERSIDE COURT - COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE COUNTY; Minutes; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2016
  • PROBATE INVESTIGATORS' REFERRAL REPORT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING CONSERVATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • CAPACITY DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING TEMPORARY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY BEVERLY FIELD, LINDA WISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (CONSERVATORSHIP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON & ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.