This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/18/2018 at 00:40:34 (UTC).

MARC SMITH -V- BIG LOTS STORES INC

Case Summary

On 09/26/2013 MARC SMITH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BIG LOTS STORES INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6805

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARC SMITH

Defendants

BIG LOTS STORES INC

TECHNICAL CHEMICALCOMPANY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2014
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 130927-0268 $7.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MARC SMITH IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MARC SMITH FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MARC SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/26/2013 OF MARC SMITH - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TECHNICAL CHEMICAL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BIG LOTS STORES INC A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant