This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 15:36:23 (UTC).

MANUELA LERMA SAUCEDO -N- DANIEL RODRIGUEZ VASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 MANUELA LERMA SAUCEDO -N- DANIEL RODRIGUEZ VASQUEZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0976

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MANUELA LERMA SAUCEDO

Respondent

DANIEL RODRIGUEZ VASQUEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 08/12/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF MANUELA LERMA SAUCEDO FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF MANUELA LERMA SAUCEDO ORDERED ENTERED 07/24/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DECLARATION OF CONDITIONAL WAIVER OF RIGHTS UNDER THE SERVICE ETC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • APPEARANCE STIPULATION WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MANUELA LERMA SAUCEDO FOR PRELIM & FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; YOUR JUDGMENT IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING:FL-141 IS INCOMPLETE FOR BOTH PARTIES.; MAKE SURE WHO WAS SERVED, HOW THEY WERE SERVED AND WHEN IS ADDRESSED. ALSO ON THE FL-180 #4F IS; A NAME TO BE RESTORED..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MANUELA LERMA SAUCEDO FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170602-0369 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MISSING DECLARATION RE SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FROM BOTH PARTIES & STIP AND WA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON DANIEL RODRIGUEZ VASQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MANUELA LERMA SAUCEDO FOR FIRST APP FEES/RFO IN THE AMOUNT OF $525.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY MANUELA LERMA SAUCEDO RE: (020617) CC/CV/CS/SS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MANUELA LERMA SAUCEDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MANUELA LERMA SAUCEDO IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MANUELA LERMA SAUCEDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.