This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:06:55 (UTC).

MANUEL SANDOVAL ESQUER

Case Summary

On 09/07/2017 MANUEL SANDOVAL ESQUER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0893

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JULIE A ESQUER

Decedent

MANUEL SANDOVAL ESQUER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BORJAS, JOSEPH D

 

Court Documents

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY DISCOVER BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $6,070.00.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY DISCOVER BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $6,070.00.

HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JULIE A ESQUER

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JULIE A ESQUER

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JULIE A ESQUER

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JULIE A ESQUER

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

RECEIPT RE: OF DISTRIBUTION FILED.

RECEIPT RE: OF DISTRIBUTION FILED.

ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED.

ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 08/20/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 08/20/18 FILED.

HRG OF 08/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY JULIE A ESQUER.

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY JULIE A ESQUER.

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, JULIE A. ESQUER APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, JULIE A. ESQUER APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

HRG OF 12/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • VACATE PRARV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/05/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - ACCOUNTING REVIEW FILED 07/09/2018 OF JULIE ESQUER ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: OF DISTRIBUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: OF DISTRIBUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF JULIE A ESQUER AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY STEVEN URENDA PRESENT FOR JULIE ESQUER, PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 09/09/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JULIE A ESQUER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JULIE A ESQUER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA BOND NOT REQUIRED RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170907-0882 $465.00; 170907-0882-CK Reference Number D3569726

    Read MoreRead Less