This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/04/2018 at 03:00:59 (UTC).

MANNO -V- BROTHERS TOWING, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/31/2012 MANNO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BROTHERS TOWING. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0329

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIZABETH A MANNO

Defendants

BROTHERS TOWING OFYUCCA VALLEY

SHAWN DOUGLAS MCEACHERN

CONNIE SUE BEAMAN

DAVID SCOTT MYERS

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY CONNIE SUE BEAMAN. (IMAGED)

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY CONNIE SUE BEAMAN. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 130411-2020 $20.00

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ELIZABETH A MANNO FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ELIZABETH A MANNO FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO SHAWN DOUGLAS MCEACHERN. PARTY SERVED ON 02/08/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO SHAWN DOUGLAS MCEACHERN. PARTY SERVED ON 02/08/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS/SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 02/08/13 AS TO CONNIE BEAMAN, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS/SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 02/08/13 AS TO CONNIE BEAMAN, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS/NEW COURT DATE/SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 02/10/13 AS TO DAVID MYERS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS/NEW COURT DATE/SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 02/10/13 AS TO DAVID MYERS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO DAVID SCOTT MYERS. PARTY SERVED ON 11/16/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO DAVID SCOTT MYERS. PARTY SERVED ON 11/16/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CONNIE SUE BEAMAN. PARTY SERVED ON 11/19/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CONNIE SUE BEAMAN. PARTY SERVED ON 11/19/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2013
  • MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROBIN RYAN; COURT REPORTER GARY RAGLE 9848; BAILIFF: J COX; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ELIZABETH A MANNO PRESENT; DEFENDANT CONNIE SUE BEAMAN PRESENT; MOTION; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; WITNESS -- ELIZABETH MANNO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- CONNIE SUE BEAMAN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; CONNIE SUE BEAMAN'S MOTION TO VACATE IS HEARD.; CONNIE SUE BEAMAN'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.; COURT FINDS THAT CONNIE SUE BEAMAN WAS AN EMPLOYEE AND STRIKES THE JUDGMENT AGAINST HER; ONLY.; SET ASIDE PARTIAL JUDGMENT AS TO CONNIE SUE BEAMAN; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY CONNIE SUE BEAMAN. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 130411-2020 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: JUDGMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM SHAWN MCEACHEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/11/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROBIN RYAN; NOT REPORTED; BAILIFF: J COX; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ELIZABETH A MANNO PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: BROTHERS TOWING OFYUCCA VALLEY, SHAWN DOUGLAS MCEACHERN, CONNIE SUE BEAMAN, DAVID SCOTT MYERS; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; WITNESS -- ELIZABETH MANNO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WAYNE HUTCHINSON IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 08/31/2012 OF ELIZABETH MANNO AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT 000100 HAVE &; RECOVER FROM 000100.; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,400.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,400.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ELIZABETH A MANNO FOR COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ELIZABETH A MANNO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO SHAWN DOUGLAS MCEACHERN. PARTY SERVED ON 02/08/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS/SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 02/08/13 AS TO CONNIE BEAMAN, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO DAVID SCOTT MYERS. PARTY SERVED ON 11/16/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CONNIE SUE BEAMAN. PARTY SERVED ON 11/19/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROSALIE MENDOZA; COURT REPORTER GARY RAGLE 9848; BAILIFF: J COX; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ELIZABETH A MANNO PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: BROTHERS TOWING OFYUCCA VALLEY, SHAWN DOUGLAS MCEACHERN, CONNIE SUE BEAMAN, DAVID SCOTT MYERS; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; PLAINTIFF REQUESTED A CONTINUANCE TO SERVE DEFENDANTS AND SUBPEONA RECORDS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/10/12 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT M4.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ELIZABETH A MANNO FOR SMALL CLAIMS FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ELIZABETH A MANNO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ELIZABETH A MANNO IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO M4

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.