This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/23/2018 at 19:34:18 (UTC).

MANNING/TAYLOR VS AMCAL CASA BELLA ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 MANNING/TAYLOR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMCAL CASA BELLA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1075

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRYSTAL TAYLOR

SHAWN MANNING

Defendants

FPI MANAGEMENT INC

AMCAL CASA BELLA FUND LP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2011
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 06/22/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; 10:55; ROBERT G FOWLER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CATHY HOWDEN; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CRYSTAL TAYLOR PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SHAWN MANNING; AMCAL CASA BELLA FUND LP, FPI MANAGEMENT INC REPRESENTED BY JENNIE GAYTAN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- CRYSTAL TAYLOR IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- JENNIE GAYTAN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION; SUBSEQUENTLY:; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION, BY THE COURT,; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; COURT FINDS JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/04/2011 OF SHAWN MANNING ORDERED ENTERED 06/20/11; JUDGMENT FOR: SHAWN MANNING, CRYSTAL TAYLOR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: AMCAL CASA BELLA FUND LP, FPI MANAGEMENT INC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $200.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $200.00; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY CLERKS OFFICE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; ROBERT G FOWLER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CAROLYN JOHNSON; NOT REPORTED; BAILIFF: B SANDANA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF SHAWN MANNING PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CRYSTAL TAYLOR; AMCAL CASA BELLA FUND LP, FPI MANAGEMENT INC REPRESENTED BY JENNIE GAYTAN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; DEFENDANTS INDICATE THAT THERE IS AN UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION PENDING ON 6-16-11. THE COURT; CONTINUES THE MATTER OVER THE PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/20/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V15.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO FPI MANAGEMENT INC; PARTY SERVED ON 05/09/11 WITH COSTS OF $10.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO AMCAL CASA BELLA FUND LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • CERTIFIED RCPT NOT SIGNED BY AGENT FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CRYSTAL TAYLOR FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY SHAWN MANNING IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SHAWN MANNING FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CRYSTAL TAYLOR IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY SHAWN MANNING, CRYSTAL TAYLOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO V15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less