This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/31/2021 at 13:07:43 (UTC).

MAGRDICIAN-V-LE BINH VAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/19/2016 MAGRDICIAN-V-LE BINH VAN was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Frangie, Janet M and Garza, Thomas S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7428

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classifieds

Frangie, Janet M

Garza, Thomas S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENNIS MAGRDICIAN

Defendants

SUPPOSE U DRIVE TRUCK RENTAL SERVICE

LE BINH VAN

ORANGE COURIER, INC.

SUPPOSE U DRIVE TRUCK LEASE

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOLINOS SHELDON &NEVELL

301 North Lake Avenue Suite 700

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorney

ACKER & WHIPPLE

811 Wilshire Blvd Ste 700

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AS TO ORANGE COURIER, INC

07/03/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AS TO ORANGE COURIER, INC

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING BASS

06/20/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING BASS

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT

06/07/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELAT

04/24/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELAT

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LE B

05/26/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LE B

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

11/10/2016: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

10/27/2016: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

NOTICE IMAGED

10/19/2016: NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketJury Trial; Original Type: Jury Trial; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketReadiness Calendar; Original Type: Readiness Calendar; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): RE-SUBMIT WITH PAGE 2 OF 2 OF THIS MANDATORY USE FORM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketJury Trial; Original Type: Jury Trial; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2016
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $2,365.00; Total Payments and Credits: $2,365.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed; Comment: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DENNIS MAGRDICIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF DENNIS MAGRDICIAN FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY DENNIS MAGRDICIAN FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE 161019-0941-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUPPOSE U DRIVE TRUCK RENTAL is a litigant

Latest cases where ORANGE COURIER INC. is a litigant