This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:40:23 (UTC).

MAGIC MOTORS VS BROWN

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 MAGIC MOTORS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BROWN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8362

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS

Defendant

ERIC(MIKE) BROWN

 

Court Documents

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ERIC(MIKE) BROWN. PARTY SERVED ON 11/11/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ERIC(MIKE) BROWN. PARTY SERVED ON 11/11/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:47; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS REPRESENTED BY MANOUCH LANKARANI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ERIC(MIKE) BROWN; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ERIC(MIKE) BROWN HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; MANOUCH LANKARANI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ERIC(MIKE) BROWN.; JUDGMENT FOR: MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ERIC(MIKE) BROWN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $125.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,625.00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171101-0371 $50.00

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2018
  • MEMO RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $7.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED UNABLE TO FORWARD AS TO ERIC (MIKE) BROWN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 01/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:47; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS REPRESENTED BY MANOUCH LANKARANI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ERIC(MIKE) BROWN; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ERIC(MIKE) BROWN HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; MANOUCH LANKARANI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ERIC(MIKE) BROWN.; JUDGMENT FOR: MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ERIC(MIKE) BROWN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $125.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,625.00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ERIC(MIKE) BROWN. PARTY SERVED ON 11/11/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171101-0371 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less