This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 08:54:51 (UTC).

MADISSON RUIS-V-MOTEL 6, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/15/2010 MADISSON RUIS-V-MOTEL 6 was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1205

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

MADISSON RUIS

MADISSON RUIS,

Petitioner

DONNA WRIGHT

Defendants and Cross Defendants

AMANDA FORBESSALWAY

CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITYM INC

CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY, INC

Cross Plaintiff

CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN BRANDT

309 N. Euclid Avenue

Upland, CA 91786

Petitioner Attorney

BRIAN BRANDT

309 N. Euclid Ave.

Upland, CA 91786

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

PACIFIC LEGAL CENTER

6363 Katella Ave.

Cypress, CA 90630

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2012
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 120813-0600 $1.08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 11/16/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • VACATE OSCVF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/15/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • NOTICE OF FUNDING OF ANNUITY FILED BY MADISSON RUIS,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • HEARING RE: DISMISSAL(SETTLED); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 11/16/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.; Disposition: COM-POST Disp.; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: TAWNY HAMADA; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT L SKOPHAMMER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRIAN BRANDTS OFFICE (DONNA 11/09/11) MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL CALLS AND REQUESTS MORE TIME TO GET PROOF OF ANNUITY.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/15/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT AMANDA FORBESSALWAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/03/2011 OF CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY INC FILED BY CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY INC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY INC, ON 10/28/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/03/2011 OF CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY INC FILED BY CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITYM INC, WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2010
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/15/2010 OF MADISSON RUIS, FOR CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY, INC, ADD MOTEL 6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PACIFIC LEGAL CENTER.; Minutes; Receipt: 101229-0666 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY, INC SERVED ON 11/01/10 WITH FEES OF $48.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR MADISSON RUIS, IS GRANTED. GUARDIAN AD LITEM IS DONNA WRIGHT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 101015-4481 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/15/2010 OF MADISSON RUIS,, CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITYM INC IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less