This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 15:09:20 (UTC).

MADDEN-V-GONZALES

Case Summary

On 03/28/2017 MADDEN-V-GONZALES was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0577

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHERYL LYNN MADDEN

Defendant

DANIEL GONZALES

 

Court Documents

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CHERYL LYNN MADDEN. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,000.00.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CHERYL LYNN MADDEN. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,000.00.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CHERYL LYNN MADDEN. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,000.00.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CHERYL LYNN MADDEN. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,000.00.

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:01; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CHERYL LYNN MADDEN PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DANIEL GONZALES; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; DANIEL GONZALES HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST DANIEL GONZALES.; JUDGMENT FOR: CHERYL LYNN MADDEN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DANIEL GONZALES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,000.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO DANIEL GONZALES. PARTY SERVED ON 04/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO DANIEL GONZALES. PARTY SERVED ON 04/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2017
  • CK 3620020551 SENT TO CHERYL MADDEN FOR $3000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CHERYL LYNN MADDEN. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • REQ TO PAY JUDGMENT MAILED TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • $3000.00 DEPOSITED IN TRUST/RECEIPT #BS-2017-00074 99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DANIEL GONZALES FOR REQUEST TO PAY JUDGMENT TO COURT; Minutes; Receipt: 170801-0464 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • REQUEST RE: JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO PAY JUDGMENT TO COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CHERYL LYNN MADDEN FOR COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO DANIEL GONZALES. PARTY SERVED ON 04/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CHERYL LYNN MADDEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CHERYL LYNN MADDEN IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CHERYL LYNN MADDEN FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less