This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 23:02:06 (UTC).

LYNCH -V- PARK

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 LYNCH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PARK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5799

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSIE M LYNCH

Defendants

LAUREN PARK

MONIQUE PARK

ROGER K PARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY GLUKHOVSKY

1550 N "D" St Suite F

San Bernardino, CA 92405

Defendant Attorneys

CLASEN, RAFFALOW

1000 Lakes Drive Suite 350

West Covina, CA 91790

CLASEN, RAFFALOW &RHOADS

1000 Lakes Drive Suite 350

West Covina, CA 91790

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLED); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • OSC RE: MEDIATION / CMC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MEDIATOR DICK LISTER FROM IVJC PRESENT.; CLERK: TRENESHA BEAMON; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GREGORY GLUKHOV PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF JESSIE M LYNCH PRESENT; ATTORNEY MATTHEW WADDELL PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; CLAIM ADJUSTER FOR DEFENSE NANCY ANDERSON PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS SETTLED.; HEARINGS:; VACATE OSCM HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/20/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36.; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL (SETTLED) SET FOR 05/29/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • FILE SENT TO SJAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • MEDIATION BRIEF BY LAUREN PARK & MONIQUE PARK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 001 TO BE ROGER K PARK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JESSIE LYNCH, ROGER K PARK IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO LAUREN PARK, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LAUREN PARK, MONIQUE PARK.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2011
  • FILE SENT TO S36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 8/05/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37 - RESCHEDULED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 8/05/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-2157 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/04/2011 OF JESSIE LYNCH - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less