This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:37:07 (UTC).

LVNV -V- SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 LVNV -V- SANCHEZ was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9541

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LIONEL SANCHEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP

420 N. Wabash Ave., Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LIONEL SANCHEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LIONEL SANCHEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • HEARING RE: 10/04/18 IS RE-ASSIGNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • HEARING RE: 10/04/18 IS RE-ASSIGNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S16J FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LIONEL SANCHEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,152.94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING LLC FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171006-0588 $196.00; 171006-0588-CK Reference Number 10060

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less