This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:37:01 (UTC).

LVNV-V-MARBURY

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 LVNV-V-MARBURY was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1555

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Defendant

ANDRE MARBURY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP

420 N. Wabash Ave., Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ANDRE MARBURY WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ANDRE MARBURY WITH COSTS OF $65.00

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ANDRE MARBURY WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ANDRE MARBURY WITH COSTS OF $65.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ANDRE MARBURY WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ANDRE MARBURY WITH COSTS OF $65.00

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ANDRE MARBURY WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ANDRE MARBURY WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ANDRE MARBURY WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0244 $196.00; 171031-0244-CK Reference Number 13053

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,434.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less