This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:46:23 (UTC).

LVNV-V-HAWKINS

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 LVNV-V-HAWKINS was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9597

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MONICA HAWKINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP

420 N. Wabash Ave., Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MONICA HAWKINS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MONICA HAWKINS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MONICA HAWKINS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,349.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171005-0136 $196.00; 171005-0136-CK Reference Number 10058

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less