This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:28:28 (UTC).

LVNV -V- DOUCET

Case Summary

On 10/03/2017 LVNV filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOUCET. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9473

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JAMES DOUCET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS & ZIDE

1445 Huntington Drive Suite 300

South Pasadena, CA 91030

 

Court Documents

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED

MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC; Disposition: GRANTED

MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY FLINT C. ZIDE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:19; MOTION; LVNV FUNDING LLC'S MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS HEARD.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; COURT FINDS:; LVNV FUNDING LLC'S MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS GRANTED.; DEFENDANTS ANSWER ADMITS EVERYTHING.; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/03/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC ORDERED ENTERED 02/28/18; JUDGMENT FOR: LVNV FUNDING LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JAMES DOUCET; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,139.86 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $369.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,509.36; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT GRANTED AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT GRANTED AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); JUDGMENT ENTERED; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:20; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LORI BRODBECK PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JAMES DOUCET; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:59; TODAYS MATTER IS CONTINUED TO TRAIL THE MOTION ON CALENDAR FOR 02/28/18.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE OF SUBMISSION ON PLA MTN FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC.

NOTICE OF SUBMISSION ON PLA MTN FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF SUBMISSION BY MAIL ON 01/22/18 AS TO JAMES DOUCET, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF SUBMISSION BY MAIL ON 01/22/18 AS TO JAMES DOUCET, FILED.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC.

MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 02/28/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 02/28/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: ON QUESTIONS #4 OF PROOF PLEASE STATE; WHAT DOCUMENT(S) YOU SERVED TO THE OTHER PARTY, OR ATTACH FORM POS-040D AS YOU INDICATED ON; PROOF.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JAMES DOUCET; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY JAMES DOUCET; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JAMES DOUCET; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/22/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JAMES DOUCET; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/22/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED

DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 1557.10 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING LLC FOR LA WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 180516-0169 $25.00; 180516-0169-CK Reference Number 20601

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $22.74)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY FLINT C. ZIDE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:19; MOTION; LVNV FUNDING LLC'S MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS HEARD.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; COURT FINDS:; LVNV FUNDING LLC'S MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS GRANTED.; DEFENDANTS ANSWER ADMITS EVERYTHING.; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/03/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC ORDERED ENTERED 02/28/18; JUDGMENT FOR: LVNV FUNDING LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JAMES DOUCET; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,139.86 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $369.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,509.36; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT GRANTED AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT GRANTED AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); JUDGMENT ENTERED; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:20; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING LLC FOR 1ST APPEARNCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0429 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,139.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less