This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:37:02 (UTC).

LVNV -V- ACEVEDO

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 LVNV -V- ACEVEDO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9540

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

DANA ACEVEDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP

420 N. Wabash Ave., Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DANA ACEVEDO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DANA ACEVEDO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • HEARING RE: 10/04/18 IS RE-ASSIGNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • HEARING RE: 10/04/18 IS RE-ASSIGNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S16J FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DANA ACEVEDO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,717.47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING LLC FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171006-0621 $196.00; 171006-0621-CK Reference Number 9716

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less