This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:58:14 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING -V- MCGOWAN

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 LVNV FUNDING -V- MCGOWAN was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3227

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ALICE MCGOWAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS & ZIDE

1445 Huntington Drive Suite 300

South Pasadena, CA 91030

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED

DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LORI BRODBECK PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:40; COUNSEL IS REQUESTING A CONTINUANCE AS AFFIDAVITS ARE STILL NEEDED.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: IN LIEU OF SANCTIONS IMPOSED..; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:40; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DECLARATION OF RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ALICE MCGOWAN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $123.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING LLC FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0608 $240.00; 170713-0608-CK Reference Number 1555

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less