This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:27:28 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING -V- MARIA ROSARIO

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 LVNV FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA ROSARIO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9462

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MARIA ROSARIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LL

420 N Wabash Ave, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARIA ROSARIO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARIA ROSARIO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARIA ROSARIO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARIA ROSARIO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARIA ROSARIO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARIA ROSARIO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE/SANCTIONS/TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:37; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER BE SET FOR A FINAL ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY PREVIOUS SANCTIONS IN THE; AMOUNT OF $140.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CRC; 3.740(E). ALSO WHY ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS OF $140.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO; APPEAR AT TODAYS HEARING AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.740(E). TOTAL SANCTION AMOUNT OF; $280.00.; COURT STATES THAT ANOTHER FAILURE TO APPEAR WILL RESULT IN MATTER BEING DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC SET FOR 06/06/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 5/4/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:38; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:33; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TODAYS HEARING AND ALSO; $50.00 FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.740(E).; TOTAL AMOUNT OF SANCTIONS THAT MAY BE IMPOSED IS $140.00; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE/SANCTIONS/TSC SET FOR 05/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/4/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:33; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARIA ROSARIO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARIA ROSARIO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARIA ROSARIO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,133.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0% PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171005-0036 $196.00; 171005-0036-CK Reference Number 10059

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less