This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:34:32 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING -V- MANJARRES

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 LVNV FUNDING -V- MANJARRES was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1542

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

FERNANDO MANJARRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP

420 N Wabash Ave Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FERNANDO MANJARRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FERNANDO MANJARRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FERNANDO MANJARRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FERNANDO MANJARRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FERNANDO MANJARRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FERNANDO MANJARRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:56; THERE BEING NO APPEARNCE, COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS AS FOLLOWS:; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $90.00 PAYABLE TO SAN BERNARDINO JUSTICE CENTER ON OR BEFORE 05/29/18.; ( $90 SANCTION IMPOSED FOR PLAINTIFFS COUSNEL FAILURE TO APPEAR); HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC SET FOR 07/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:56; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FERNANDO MANJARRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FERNANDO MANJARRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FERNANDO MANJARRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,030.36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/30/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0708 $196.00; 171031-0708-CK Reference Number 13052

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less