This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:43:53 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING -V- JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 LVNV FUNDING -V- JOHNSON was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3166

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BRIAN JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS & ZIDE

1445 Huntington Dr, Suite 300

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LORI BRODBECK PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:40; COUNSEL IS REQUESTING A CONTINUANCE AS AFFIDAVITS ARE STILL NEEDED.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: IN LIEU OF SANCTIONS IMPOSED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:40; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DECLARATION OF RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SVC IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 10/10/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PROOF OF SERVICE WAS PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 10/10/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BRIAN JOHNSON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $123.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0920 $240.00; 170711-0920-CK Reference Number 1881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less