This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:51:05 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING-V-DEPALMA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 LVNV FUNDING-V-DEPALMA was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9628

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MARIA DEPALMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP

420 N. Wabash Ave., Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/04/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/04/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/04/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/19/18; JUDGMENT FOR: LVNV FUNDING LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIA DEPALMA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,708.23 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $326.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,034.23; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MARIA DEPALMA.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MARIA DEPALMA.

DISMISSAL FILED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/04/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/04/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARIA DEPALMA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARIA DEPALMA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARIA DEPALMA WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARIA DEPALMA WITH COSTS OF $65.00

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/04/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/04/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/19/18; JUDGMENT FOR: LVNV FUNDING LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIA DEPALMA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,708.23 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $326.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,034.23; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MARIA DEPALMA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/04/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC AS TO MARIA DEPALMA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/04/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,708.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING LLC FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171017-0210 $196.00; 171017-0210-CK Reference Number 10197

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less