This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 09:05:29 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING-V-BOOKER

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 LVNV FUNDING-V-BOOKER was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9703

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MONIQUE BOOKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LL

420 N Wabash Ave, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MONIQUE BOOKER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MONIQUE BOOKER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • HEARING RE: 10/04/18 IS RE-ASSIGNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • HEARING RE: 10/04/18 IS RE-ASSIGNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S16J FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MONIQUE BOOKER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171006-0485 $196.00; 171006-0485-CK Reference Number 10199

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less