This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 10:05:25 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC-V-WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC-V-WILLIAMS was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3317

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

NEFERTITI WILLIAMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS & ZIDE

1445 Huntington Dr, Suite 300

South Pasadena, CA 91030

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION RE: NON- MILITARY STATUS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: NON- MILITARY STATUS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DECLARATION OF RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LORI BRODBECK PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:48; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF COUNSEL.; REASON: WAITING FOR CORRECTION ON PROOF OF SERVICE.; COURT IS INCLINED TO IMPOSE SANCTIONS FOR NON-COMPIANCE WITH CRC 3.740(E) AND SET MATTER; FOR FURTHER OSC WHY SANCTIONS $100.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR NON-COMPLIANCE WITH CRC 3.740(F).; PLAINTIFF COUNSEL REQUESTS TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN LIEU OF SANCTIONS.; ON PLAINTIFF COUNSELS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: PLAINTIFF COUNSELS REQUEST.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:49; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: IN RESPONSE TO OSC FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: REGINA ESTRADA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LORI BRODBECK PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:34; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS.; REASON: MORE TIME NEEDED TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE.; THE COURT CONTINUES THIS MATTER AND SETS AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT; OF $50.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.740(E). THE COURT FURTHER SETS; A TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IF PROOF OF SERVICE IS EFFECTED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC SET FOR 04/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; 08:35; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST USE MANDATORY FORM POS-010 FOR SUMMONS/COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,384.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: NON- MILITARY STATUS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0267 $240.00; 170713-0267-CK Reference Number 1883

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less