This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 15:45:58 (UTC).

LUNA v FONTANA EXPRESS

Case Summary

On 08/03/2015 LUNA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FONTANA EXPRESS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6047

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONARTH LUNA

Defendants

FONTANA EXPRESS CAR WASH

CHANTY ALVAREZ

SAM KHIEV

AFAB SERVICES INC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/28/15

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/28/15

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF AFAB SERVICES INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF AFAB SERVICES INC FILED.

HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Under Submission

HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF DONARTH LUNA PRESENT; AFAB SERVICES INC REPRESENTED BY SAM KHIEV.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 08/03/2015 OF DONARTH LUNA.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:18; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- DONARTH LUNA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; SAM KHIEV IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; 11:34; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR - FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR - FILED.

HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Continued

HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; COREY LEE, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DONARTH LUNA; DANIA LUNA (WIFE OF PLAINTIFF) PRESENT.; AFAB SERVICES INC REPRESENTED BY SAM KHIEV.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:59; WIFE OF PLAINTIFF STATES THAT PLAINTIFF IS UNABLE TO MAKE TODAYS HEARING AND SHE IS HERE TO; REPRESENT HER HUSBAND.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: FOR PLAINTIFF TO BE PRESENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/17/15 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO NOTIFY PARTIES OF NEXT HEARING; 11:05; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF AFAB SERVICES INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF AFAB SERVICES INC FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:28; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF DONARTH LUNA PRESENT; AFAB SERVICES INC REPRESENTED BY KENNY MILLAN.; CHANTY ALVAREZ, SAM KHIEV REPRESENTED BY KENNY MILLAN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; WITNESS -- DONARTH LUNA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; KENNY MILLAN IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; COURT WILL AMEND THE CLAIM TO REFLECT THE PROPER DEFENDANT; TO BE AFAB SERVICES INC DBA FONTANA EXPRESS CAR WASH; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 11:47; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO AFAB SERVICES INC. PARTY SERVED ON 08/06/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO AFAB SERVICES INC. PARTY SERVED ON 08/06/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO CHANTY ALVAREZ. PARTY SERVED ON 08/06/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO CHANTY ALVAREZ. PARTY SERVED ON 08/06/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO SAM KHIEV. PARTY SERVED ON 08/06/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO SAM KHIEV. PARTY SERVED ON 08/06/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 150803-0172 $33.00; 150803-0172-CK Reference Number 3011

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2015
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/28/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF AFAB SERVICES INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON APPEAL FILED 10/16/2015 OF DONARTH LUNA ORDERED ENTERED 12/17/15; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT AFAB SERVICES INC; AND AGAINST DONARTH LUNA; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO (CIV); DISPOSITION - SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF DONARTH LUNA PRESENT; AFAB SERVICES INC REPRESENTED BY SAM KHIEV.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 08/03/2015 OF DONARTH LUNA.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:18; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- DONARTH LUNA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; SAM KHIEV IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; 11:34; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR - FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; COREY LEE, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DONARTH LUNA; DANIA LUNA (WIFE OF PLAINTIFF) PRESENT.; AFAB SERVICES INC REPRESENTED BY SAM KHIEV.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:59; WIFE OF PLAINTIFF STATES THAT PLAINTIFF IS UNABLE TO MAKE TODAYS HEARING AND SHE IS HERE TO; REPRESENT HER HUSBAND.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: FOR PLAINTIFF TO BE PRESENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/17/15 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO NOTIFY PARTIES OF NEXT HEARING; 11:05; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF APPEAL TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AFAB SERVICES INC FOR APPEAL; Minutes; Receipt: 151016-0633 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 08/03/2015 OF DONARTH LUNA FILED BY AFAB SERVICES INC.(SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF AFAB SERVICES INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:28; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF DONARTH LUNA PRESENT; AFAB SERVICES INC REPRESENTED BY KENNY MILLAN.; CHANTY ALVAREZ, SAM KHIEV REPRESENTED BY KENNY MILLAN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; WITNESS -- DONARTH LUNA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; KENNY MILLAN IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; COURT WILL AMEND THE CLAIM TO REFLECT THE PROPER DEFENDANT; TO BE AFAB SERVICES INC DBA FONTANA EXPRESS CAR WASH; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 11:47; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO AFAB SERVICES INC. PARTY SERVED ON 08/06/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO CHANTY ALVAREZ. PARTY SERVED ON 08/06/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO SAM KHIEV. PARTY SERVED ON 08/06/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 150803-0172 $33.00; 150803-0172-CK Reference Number 3011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less