This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 03:34:27 (UTC).

LUGO -V- SAFARILAND

Case Summary

On 02/08/2017 LUGO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SAFARILAND. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1753

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHELLE LUGO

Defendants

TODD MACKLER

SAFARILAND, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

TIM O'BRIEN

SAFARILAND, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

POPE, BERGER, WILLIAMS & REYNOLDS, LLP

401 B Street Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

BERGER, WILLIAMS &REYNOLDS, LLP

401 B Street Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON

333 South Hope Street 43Rd Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

ANSWER FILED BY SAFARILAND, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON.

ANSWER FILED BY SAFARILAND, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON.

ANSWER FILED BY TIM O'BRIEN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON.

ANSWER FILED BY TIM O'BRIEN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY MAIL ON 08/08/17 AS TO SHEPPARD, MULLIN, RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY MAIL ON 08/08/17 AS TO SHEPPARD, MULLIN, RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP, FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MICHELLE LUGO.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MICHELLE LUGO.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TODD MACKLER, TIM O'BRIEN.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TODD MACKLER, TIM O'BRIEN.

NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF TRANSFER SENT TO ALL PARTIES FILED.

NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF TRANSFER SENT TO ALL PARTIES FILED.

RETURN RECEIPT FOR RECORDS FILED.

RETURN RECEIPT FOR RECORDS FILED.

NOTICE OF SIGNING OF AN ORDER RE CHANGE OF VENUE A ND REQUEST FOR PAYMENT OF FEES (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF SIGNING OF AN ORDER RE CHANGE OF VENUE A ND REQUEST FOR PAYMENT OF FEES (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT (IMAGED)

DEF SAFARILAND MOTION FOR PREMPTORY CHALLENGE 170. 6 FOR JUDGE JOHN S MEYER FILED.

DEF SAFARILAND MOTION FOR PREMPTORY CHALLENGE 170. 6 FOR JUDGE JOHN S MEYER FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

APPENDIX OF DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT O F MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FILED.

APPENDIX OF DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT O F MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FILED.

MOTION RE: TO TRANSFER VENUE SET FOR HEARING ON 06/09/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT TODD MACKLER, TIM O'BRIEN, SAFARILAND, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO TRANSFER VENUE SET FOR HEARING ON 06/09/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT TODD MACKLER, TIM O'BRIEN, SAFARILAND, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED (IMAGED)

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MICHELLE LUGO

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MICHELLE LUGO

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT (8-17-18) FILED BY DEFENDANT TODD MACKLER, TIM O'BRIEN, SAFARILAND, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • MOTION RE: CMPL FRTHR RSPNS TO REQ FOR ADMIS SET 1 (7/19/18) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MICHELLE LUGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • MOTION RE: CMPL FRTHR RSPNS TO REQ FOR PROD SET 1 (07/19/18) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MICHELLE LUGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • MOTION RE: CMPL FRTHR RSPNS TO EMP LAW FORM ROGS SET 1 (07/19/18) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MICHELLE LUGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • MOTION RE: CMPL FRTHR RSPNS TO REQ FOR ADMIS SET 1 (7/19/18) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MICHELLE LUGO; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; SARA J. WALLER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MICHELLE LUGO.; ATTORNEY JONI NOGGLE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR MTN TO CMPL FURTHER RESP TO REQ FOR ADMISSION SET.; HEARING IS CONTINUED ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION FOR COUNSEL TO FURTHER MEET AND CONFER REGARDING; THE DISPUTED DISCOVERY. PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IS DIRECTED TO SUBMIT AN UPDATED SEPARATE STATEMENT; PROVIDING NECESSARY INFORMATION AS TO EACH DISCOVERY REQUEST AND RESPONSES THAT ARE AT; ISSUE, AND WHICH EXPLAINS THE FACTUAL AND LEGAL REASONS FOR COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES,; ANSWERS, OR PRODUCTION AS TO EACH MATTER IN DISPUTE.; THE COURT RESERVES ON THE ISSUE OF IMPOSING SANCTIONS REQUESTED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NOTICE WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • MOTION RE: CMPL FRTHR RSPNS TO REQ FOR PROD SET 1 (07/19/18) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MICHELLE LUGO; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; SARA J. WALLER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MICHELLE LUGO.; ATTORNEY JONI NOGGLE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR MTN TO CMPL FURTHER RESP TO REQ FOR PROD SET 1.; HEARING IS CONTINUED ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION FOR COUNSEL TO FURTHER MEET AND CONFER REGARDING; THE DISPUTED DISCOVERY. PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IS DIRECTED TO SUBMIT AN UPDATED SEPARATE STATEMENT; PROVIDING NECESSARY INFORMATION AS TO EACH DISCOVERY REQUEST AND RESPONSES THAT ARE AT; ISSUE, AND WHICH EXPLAINS THE FACTUAL AND LEGAL REASONS FOR COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES,; ANSWERS, OR PRODUCTION AS TO EACH MATTER IN DISPUTE.; THE COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION OVER ISSUANCE OF SANCTIONS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NOTICE WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • MOTION RE: CMPL FRTHR RSPNS TO EMP LAW FORM ROGS SET 1 (07/19/18) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MICHELLE LUGO; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; SARA J. WALLER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MICHELLE LUGO.; ATTORNEY JONI NOGGLE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR MTN TO CMPL FURTHER RESP TO EMP LAW FORM RROGS.; HEARING IS CONTINUED ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION FOR COUNSEL TO FURTHER MEET AND CONFER REGARDING; THE DISPUTED DISCOVERY. PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IS DIRECTED TO SUBMIT AN UPDATED SEPARATE STATEMENT; PROVIDING NECESSARY INFORMATION AS TO EACH DISCOVERY REQUEST AND RESPONSES THAT ARE AT; ISSUE, AND WHICH EXPLAINS THE FACTUAL AND LEGAL REASONS FOR COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES,; ANSWERS, OR PRODUCTION AS TO EACH MATTER IN DISPUTE.; THE COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION TO IMPOSE SANCTIONS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NOTICE WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • REPLY TO TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: CMPL FURTHER RESPONSE TO EMPLOYMENT FORM RROGS SET FOR HEARING ON 08/29/18 FILED BY MICHELLE LUGO. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2017
  • ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MICHELLE LUGO, SAFARILAND, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MICHELLE LUGO, SAFARILAND, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MICHELLE LUGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • SAN DIEGO SUPERIOR COURTS REGISTER OF ACTIONS PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MICHELLE LUGO FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less