This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 02:08:02 (UTC).

LUCIA FRANCISCA ALVARADO - MAURICIO CERDAS

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 LUCIA FRANCISCA ALVARADO - MAURICIO CERDAS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8610

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUCIA FRANCISCA ALVARADO

Respondent

MAURICIO CERDAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • HEARING OSC DISMISSAL OF ACTION/FAILURE TO TRIAL (5 YEARS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • VACATE RSC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION/SUMMONS BY MAIL ON 10/26/17 AS TO MAURICIO CERDAS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION/SUMMONS/I&E DECL/PROP DECL FILED AS TO MAURICIO CERDAS. PARTY SERVED ON 11/06/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • VACATE SPOS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/04/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • INFORMATIONAL CHECK LIST PROVIDED TO LUCIA FRANCISCA ALVARADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LUCIA FRANCISCA ALVARADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0881 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less