This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:50:13 (UTC).

LOWELL -V- GIANT RV ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/13/2017 LOWELL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GIANT RV. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7950

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAMELA LOWELL

ROBERT LOWELL

Defendants

GIANT RV

THOR MOTOR COACH

GIANT INLAND EMPIRE RV CENTER,INC.

THOR MOTOR COACH, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL GELLER

3576 Arlington Ave Suite 210

Riverside, CA 92506

Defendant Attorney

SUMMERS & SHIVES, APC

8525 Gibbs Drive Suite 115

San Diego, CA 92123-1758

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF BALANCE OF FEES DUE ($30.00) SENT.

NOTICE OF BALANCE OF FEES DUE ($30.00) SENT.; Minutes; WE RECEIVED CHECK # 22676 IN THE AMOUNT OF $120.00 FOR TWO HEARINGS ( MTN TO STAY &; JOINDER). FEES ARE $90.00 FOR ONE & $60.00 FOR THE SECOND, FOR A TOTAL OF $150.00 THERE IS; A BALANCE OF $30.00 OWING. PLEASE REMIT $30.00 BEFORE; APRIL 6, 2018 TO KEEP YOUR JOINDER ON CALENDAR. THANK YOU

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO STAY; SUPRTNG DOCS; JOINDER BY MAIL ON 03/14/18 AS TO PLTFS ATTY, MICHAEL S. GELLER, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO STAY; SUPRTNG DOCS; JOINDER BY MAIL ON 03/14/18 AS TO PLTFS ATTY, MICHAEL S. GELLER, FILED.

MOTION RE: JOINDER OF GIANT TO THORS MOTION TO STAY ACTIONS SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT GIANT INLAND EMPIRERV CENTER,INC. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: JOINDER OF GIANT TO THORS MOTION TO STAY ACTIONS SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT GIANT INLAND EMPIRERV CENTER,INC. (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF MARK D. STANLEY ISO MOTION TO STAY ACTION FILED.

DECLARATION OF MARK D. STANLEY ISO MOTION TO STAY ACTION FILED.

DECLARATION OF DOLORES E. GONZALES ISO MTN TO STAY ACTION FILED

DECLARATION OF DOLORES E. GONZALES ISO MTN TO STAY ACTION FILED

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY THOR MOTOR COACH, INC..

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY THOR MOTOR COACH, INC..

MOTION RE: STAY ACTION BASED ON INCONVENIENT FORUM SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT THOR MOTOR COACH, INC. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: STAY ACTION BASED ON INCONVENIENT FORUM SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT THOR MOTOR COACH, INC. (IMAGED)

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY GIANT INLAND EMPIRERV CENTER,INC., THOR MOTOR COACH, INC.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY GIANT INLAND EMPIRERV CENTER,INC., THOR MOTOR COACH, INC.

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED BY GIANT INLAND EMPIRERV CENTER,INC., THOR MOTOR COACH, INC..

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED BY GIANT INLAND EMPIRERV CENTER,INC., THOR MOTOR COACH, INC..

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO THOR MOTOR COACH, INC.; PARTY SERVED ON 09/22/17 WITH COSTS OF $7.71 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO THOR MOTOR COACH, INC.; PARTY SERVED ON 09/22/17 WITH COSTS OF $7.71 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

NOTICE OF REJECTION NOTICE SENT.

NOTICE OF REJECTION NOTICE SENT.; Minutes; ON PROOF OF SERVICE MUST COMPLETE 3B, 6D, AND MUST HAVE ORIGINALS OF THE CERTIFIED MAIL; RECEIPTS.; NOTICES PRINTED

ANSWER FILED BY THOR MOTOR COACH, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SUMMERS & SHIVES, APC.

ANSWER FILED BY THOR MOTOR COACH, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SUMMERS & SHIVES, APC.

ANSWER FILED BY GIANT INLAND EMPIRERV CENTER,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SUMMERS & SHIVES, APC.

ANSWER FILED BY GIANT INLAND EMPIRERV CENTER,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SUMMERS & SHIVES, APC.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/24/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ROBERT LOWELL, PAMELA LOWELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0077806236

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT LOWELL, PAMELA LOWELL FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 180720-0336 $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ROBERT MORRIS FOR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOLORES E GONZALES APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GIANT INLAND EMPIRERV CENTER,INC., THOR MOTOR COACH, INC..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT CONFERS WITH COUNSEL REGARDING CASE STATUS. COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THAT A TENTATIVE; SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS PENDING.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/24/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • MOTION RE: STAY ACTION BASED ON INCONVENIENT FORUM FILED BY DEFENDANT THOR MOTOR COACH, INC.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • MOTION RE: JOINDER OF GIANT TO THORS MOTION TO STAY ACTION FILED BY DEFENDANT GIANT INLAND EMPIRERV CENTER,INC.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF JOINDER TO MOTION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NITOCE WAS FILED 4/13/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/13/2017 OF ROBERT LOWELL, GIANT INLAND EMPIRERV CENTER,INC. IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GIANT RV; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ROBERT LOWELL, PAMELA LOWELL FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT LOWELL, PAMELA LOWELL FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0401 $435.00; 170915-0401-CK Reference Number CK 16246

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less