This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 10:45:35 (UTC).

LOUIS-V-UNITED STATE MARINE CORP

Case Summary

On 09/19/2016 LOUIS-V-UNITED STATE MARINE CORP was filed as a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5323

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARETHA FAYE LOUIS

Defendant

UNITED STATES MARINE CORPS. TWENTYNINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF CARSON C NEWTON

203 W Santa Fe Ave

Placentia, CA 92870

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION FILED.

ORIGINAL NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF HEARING SENT.; Minutes; A HEARING HAS BEEN SET RE STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT ON AUGUST 07, 2017 AT 08:30 IN; DEPARTMENT S25; NOTICES PRINTED

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY UNITED STATES MARINE CORPS. TWENTYNINE. FEDERAL NUMBER EDCV 17-171.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY UNITED STATES MARINE CORPS. TWENTYNINE. FEDERAL NUMBER EDCV 17-171.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER STATUS HEARING RE: REMOVAL TO FED COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER STATUS HEARING RE: REMOVAL TO FED COURT; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE FOR TODAYS HEARING AND NO WRITTEN UPDATE PROVIDED, THE COURT HEREBY; CONTINUES THE FURTHER STATUS HEARING RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT AND ALSO SETS AN OSC RE:; DISMISSAL AS FOLLOWS:; IF NO WRITTEN UPDATE IS PROVIDED TO THE COURT AND NO APPEARANCE IS MADE ON THE CONTINUANCE DATE,; THEN THE COURT MAY WELL ORDER THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/04/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 8/6/18 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE AT TODAYS HEARING, THE COURT HEREBY CONTINUES THIS HEARING AS FOLLOWS:; APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL IS REQUIRED ON THE CONTINUANCE DATE IF NO WRITTEN UPDATE IS; PROVIDED TO THE COURT.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: FURTHER STATUS HEARING RE: REMOVAL TO FED COURT SET FOR 08/06/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 2/5/18 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; COURT ATTENDANT GARY TREADWAY; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 09:04; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF THE COURT.; REASON: NO APPEARANCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 08/07/17 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING SENT.; Minutes; A HEARING HAS BEEN SET RE STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT ON AUGUST 07, 2017 AT 08:30 IN; DEPARTMENT S25; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • STAY OF EXECUTION GRANTED ON CASE. REASON: HIGHER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ARETHA FAYE LOUIS FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ARETHA FAYE LOUIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ARETHA FAYE LOUIS IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.