This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 04:56:16 (UTC).

LOUIE MOCA-V-RANDY MONTANO

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 LOUIE MOCA-V-RANDY MONTANO was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1619

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOUIE MOCA

Defendants

RANDY MONTANO

REBECCA MONTANO

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB); Minutes; Receipt: 170728-0863 $25.00; 170728-0863-CK Reference Number 1175040

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF LOUIE MOCA ORDERED ENTERED 07/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: LOUIE MOCA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RANDY MONTANO, REBECCA MONTANO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: RANDY MONTANO, REBECCA MONTANO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.; ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RANDY MONTANO, REBECCA MONTANO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RANDY MONTANO, REBECCA MONTANO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/14/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/14/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RANDY MONTANO; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RANDY MONTANO; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON REBECCA MONTANO; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON REBECCA MONTANO; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0575 $255.00; 170714-0575-CK Reference Number 1176082

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB); Minutes; Receipt: 170728-0863 $25.00; 170728-0863-CK Reference Number 1175040

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF LOUIE MOCA ORDERED ENTERED 07/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: LOUIE MOCA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RANDY MONTANO, REBECCA MONTANO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: RANDY MONTANO, REBECCA MONTANO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RANDY MONTANO, REBECCA MONTANO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF LOUIE MOCA AS TO RANDY MONTANO, REBECCA MONTANO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF LOUIE MOCA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/14/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RANDY MONTANO; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON REBECCA MONTANO; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0575 $255.00; 170714-0575-CK Reference Number 1176082

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $75.00.--BEGINNING ON 07/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less