This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 17:01:41 (UTC).

LOPEZ VS. THE PRINTERS

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 LOPEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE PRINTERS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7149

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

DAVID M LOPEZ

THE PRINTERS

Defendant and Other

THE PRINTERS

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO THE PRINTERS. PARTY SERVED ON 09/29/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO THE PRINTERS. PARTY SERVED ON 09/29/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0649 $50.00

SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY DAVID M LOPEZ

SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY DAVID M LOPEZ

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY THE PRINTERS

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY THE PRINTERS; Minutes; Receipt: 171011-0012 $30.00; 171011-0012-CK Reference Number 3052

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 11/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; PLAINTIFFS CLAIM:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DAVID LOPEZ ORDERED ENTERED 11/09/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DAVID M LOPEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: THE PRINTERS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,600.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $50.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,650.00; DEFENDANTS CLAIM:; JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 10/11/2017 OF THE PRINTERS ORDERED ENTERED 11/09/17; JUDGMENT FOR: THE PRINTERS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DAVID M LOPEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,086.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,116.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF THE PRINTERS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF DAVID M LOPEZ PRESENT; THE PRINTERS REPRESENTED BY BAHA AZARI.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:43; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; PARTIES AGREE TO PROCEED WITH TRIAL AS TO BOTH CLAIMS.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- DAVID LOPEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; BAHA AZARI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; RECESS TAKEN UNTIL 1:30PM.; 12:00; 01:32; WITNESS -- DAVID LOPEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- BAHA AZARI IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; 01:45; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY THE PRINTERS; Minutes; Receipt: 171011-0012 $30.00; 171011-0012-CK Reference Number 3052

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO THE PRINTERS. PARTY SERVED ON 09/29/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DAVID M LOPEZ FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170922-0507 $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • PARTY THE PRINTERS UPDATED: ADDING AGENT FOR SERVICE/SUITE #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY DAVID M LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0649 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less