This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 09:20:59 (UTC).

LOPEZ -V- BARTLEY,ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 LOPEZ -V- BARTLEY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1839

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFREY DAVID LOPEZ

Defendants

TERESA MORALES

DARYL BARTLEY

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS FILED AS TO TERESA MORALES. PARTY SERVED ON 11/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $35.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS FILED AS TO TERESA MORALES. PARTY SERVED ON 11/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $35.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0694 $75.00; 171030-0694-CK Reference Number 10154

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DARYL BARTLEY SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DARYL BARTLEY SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DARYL BARTLEY FOR CONTINUANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180108-0236 $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JEFFREY DAVID LOPEZ PRESENT; DEFENDANT DARYL BARTLEY, TERESA MORALES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF ALL PARTIES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; $10.00 FEE FOR CONTINUANCE IS TO BE PAID BY DEFENDANT.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 1/8/18 MINUTES TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS FILED AS TO TERESA MORALES. PARTY SERVED ON 11/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $35.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DARYL BARTLEY SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0694 $75.00; 171030-0694-CK Reference Number 10154

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less